Financial history EPWORTH IMPERIAL HALL

Charity Number: 701127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.70k £23.64k £25.28k £17.04k £14.25k
Total expenditure £11.15k £20.58k £10.67k £20.07k £26.08k
Income from government contracts £382 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.98k £12.27k £16.30k £3.14k N/A