Trustees FREE METHODIST CHURCH OF PENWORTHAM
Charity number: 701133

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moira Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Mason | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tim Young | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Xiaoyin Guan | Trustee | 02 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Cockeram | Trustee | 02 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Joy Carey | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zena Antell | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wylie | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tony Morton Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Anthony Giddings PhD, BA | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Moll | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.