THE LYTHAM HERITAGE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public in the geography,history&natural history, archaeology & architecture of the Ancient Parish of Lytham;to preserve, protect, develop & improve buildings of historic or architectural interest;to foster & stimulate public interest in its history & heritage;to form & to encourage others to form a collection of material & make this available for public exhibition from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
Governance
- 03 February 1989: Standard registration
- 02 July 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS SUE FORSHAW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katharine Mary Wykes | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Thomas Stringer | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Trueman | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr Steve Williams | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|||||
David John Hoyle | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BELL | Trustee | 01 December 2012 |
|
|||||
AUDREY GEORGINA KIRBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.77k | £32.21k | £28.21k | £23.99k | £27.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.95k | £34.51k | £14.21k | £22.66k | £35.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2023 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 June 2023 | 505 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/11/1988 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/1990 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/1991 AS AMENDED ON 09/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/06/2011 as amended on 09 Sept 2024 as amended on 09 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE GROUP IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES RELATING TO THE AREA COMPRISING THE ANCIENT PARISH OF LYTHAM THAT SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT' 1. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. TO PRESERVE, PROTECT, DEVELOP AND IMPROVE BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 3. TO FOSTER AND STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN ITS HISTORY AND HERITAGE. 4. TO FORM AND TO ENCOURAGE OTHER INSTITUTIONS TO FORM A COLLECTION OF PHOTOGRAPHS, DOCUMENTS, FILMS AND OTHER ARTEFACTS OF AN EDUCATIONAL AND HISTORICAL NATURE AND TO MAKE THESE AVAILABLE FOR PUBLIC EXHIBITION FROM TIME.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF LYTHAM
Linked charities
- 03 February 1989 : Standard registration
- 02 July 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HERITAGE CENTRE
2 HENRY STREET
LYTHAM
LYTHAM ST ANNES
LANCASHIRE
FY8 5LE
- Phone:
- 01253730787
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window