ALTRINCHAM ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Increase awareness in road safety and improve driver capability by preparing drivers for the IAMRoadSmart Advanced Driving Test. The service is provided within areas of South Manchester, all of Trafford and areas of North Cheshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
- Trafford
Governance
- 02 February 1989: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 November 2009: Standard registration
- ALTRINCHAM GROUP ADVANCED MOTORISTS (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY WRIGHT | Chair | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charles Leigh | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Melling | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Monica Brady | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maldwyn Timms | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Poyner | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA ROSMOND BAGLEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £827 | £452 | £777 | £54.99k | £1.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £467 | £1.02k | £2.72k | £2.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JANUARY 1989
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE BETTER STANDARDS OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY BY HELPING MOTORISTS AND MOTOR CYCLISTS TO PASS TE ADVANCED TEST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Marford Crescent
SALE
M33 4DL
- Phone:
- 01619739002
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window