FOREST TOWN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Members meet monthly to hear speakers and learn about different issues. We enjoy social occasions, outings, and raise money for needy local cases as required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 February 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELAINE ROSALYN PINNICK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Eskriett | Trustee | 17 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Allan | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Genni Gent | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
lesley metheringham | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Macutkiewicz | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Wortley | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
June Harrison | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bright | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Fryer | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Betty Pinnick | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MAIRI HUNTER-SPOKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH DOWNING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN FORROW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.86k | £3.78k | £5.39k | £8.31k | £8.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.79k | £3.59k | £4.46k | £7.63k | £8.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMENS' INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
FOREST TOWN MANSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 BERESFORD ROAD
MANSFIELD WOODHOUSE
MANSFIELD
NG19 8QP
- Phone:
- 01623644356
- Email:
- elaine.pinnick@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window