NUNEATON AND NORTH WARWICKSHIRE EQUESTRIAN CENTRE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing horse riding activities for disabled persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,891 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 10 February 1989: Standard registration
- NUNEATON AND NORTH WARWICKSHIRE EQUESTRIAN CENTRE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Gadsby | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Belma Varda Kumar | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jason Liddle | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Wright | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brindley | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain Douglas Ashby | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.93k | £265.23k | £247.45k | £266.97k | £247.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.15k | £240.22k | £314.18k | £284.92k | £257.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £99.60k | N/A | £47.40k | £30.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2023 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2023 | 262 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 DECEMBER 1988. as amended on 23 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RIDING AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES SO THAT ALL DISABLED PERSONS WHO WOULD BENEFIT IN THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH FROM RIDING AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES SHALL BE GIVEN THE OPPORTUNITY TO DO SO.
Area of benefit
NUNEATON, NORTH WARWICKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nuneaton & North Warks Group Riding
Valley Road
Galley Common
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV10 9NJ
- Phone:
- 02476392397
- Email:
- info@nnwec.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window