Trustees THE MALTINGS (BERWICK) TRUST

Charity number: 701194
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Adam Johnston Jarrod Hood Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Matthew Simon Runham Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Jacqueline Helen Wicks Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Aldo Salvatore Gaeta Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Fiona Brown Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Wendy Elizabeth Barrett Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Helen Milner Trustee 15 August 2022
None on record
Benjamin James Curthoys Trustee 12 August 2022
None on record
Scott Rathman Sherrard Trustee 19 April 2016
BERWICK BARRACKS HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Joe Lang Trustee 16 December 2014
BERWICK BARRACKS HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
BERWICK VISITOR CENTRE (WALKERGATE)
Received: On time