Financial history THE KING'S CHURCH, HALIFAX

Charity Number: 701196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £177.41k £142.71k £167.96k £169.99k £177.00k
Total expenditure £170.40k £147.44k £154.23k £142.41k £182.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.87k £1.09k N/A N/A