POWYS AIDS LINE SERVICE (P A L S )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PALS provides HIV Support & Sexual Health Information Services thro'out Powys, mid-Wales. PALS offers social care support to people living with HIV, as well as outreach & (sexual) health promotion work - (with young people & men who have sex with men) - including provision of free condoms. PALS participates in related national & community events to reduce stigma & discrimination & raise awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Powys
Governance
- 17 February 1989: Standard registration
- 26 May 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 26 May 2009: Funds transferred to 288527 THE TERRENCE HIGGINS TRUST
- PALS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.10k | £30.66k | £3.58k | £32.06k | £32.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.68k | £24.79k | £23.53k | £28.10k | £28.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 30 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 06 March 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 16 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 22 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 19 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 19 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 20 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 20 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JANUARY 1989 (AS AMENDED 23RD MAY 2000)
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AMONGST PERSONS RESIDENT IN POWYS WHO ARE INFECTED WITH HIV THE CAUSITIVE AGENTS OF AIDS OR WORRIED THEY MAY BE INFECTED AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY,SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THOSE WHO SUFFER FROM HUMAN IMMUNO DEFICIENCY VIRUS AND RELATED ILLNESSES, AND TO FURTHER EDUCATION INTO THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF HIV AND RELATED ILLNESSES.
Area of benefit
POWYS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window