BOS MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We produce two musicals a year shown at a local theatre for members of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 23 February 1989: Standard registration
- THE BIRKDALE ORPHEUS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Harris | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Casserley | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Browne | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Billington | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG ALAN BILLINGTON | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE POWELL | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL POWER | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY POWER | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL CORCORAN | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZ CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS JOHN LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.18k | £7.07k | £8.64k | £43.08k | £92.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.85k | £4.60k | £6.94k | £43.52k | £78.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSITUTION ADOPTED 1959 AMENDED ON 26/10/1988, AMENDED ON 04/03/2014 as amended on 28 Mar 2023 as amended on 28 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO CULTIVATE THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS AND IMPROVE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC TASTE IN THOSE ARTS AND TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SOCIETY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES OPPORTUNITIES. FOR THE MEMBERS TO MEET FOR THE PURPOSE OF CREATING AND ENCOURAGING INTEREST (AND ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN) OPERATIVE WORKS AND FOR SOCIAL AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Aveling Drive
Banks
SOUTHPORT
Merseyside
PR9 8SJ
- Phone:
- 07516709198
- Email:
- treasurer@bosmtc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window