Financial history THE WINDMILL HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 701254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £48.07k £22.80k £27.49k £44.77k £41.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A