Financial history Burbage Band (Buxton)

Charity number: 701257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £28.70k £11.80k £22.21k £13.46k £19.90k
Total expenditure £39.40k £6.52k £6.41k £22.10k £19.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £920 £3.00k £17.07k N/A N/A