Trustees PEASHOLME CHARITY
Charity number: 701265

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Dixon | Chair | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Brook | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Kerr | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Pavlovic | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elain Hughes | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN PETER MORLEY | Trustee | 04 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HOWARD PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.