THE RIBBLE LINK TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain an over view of the running of the Ribble Link
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 01 March 1989: Standard registration
- 12 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.27k | £2.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £307.64k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 1989.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONTRUCTION TO GOOD AND NAVIGABLE ORDER OF A NAVIGABLE WATERWAY AND ALL BUILDINGS, WORKS AND STUCTURES ASSOCIATED THERE-WITH (HEREIANFTER CALLED "THE RIBBLE LINK") LINKING THE LANCASTER CANAL WITH THE RIVER RIBBLE AND THUS WITH OTHER NAVIGABLE WATERWAYS FORMING PART OF THE COUNTRYWIDE NETWORK OFINLAND WATERWAYS AND TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE RIBBLE LINK FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE BENEFIT OR THE PUBLIC. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3(B)-(D) OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window