Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN - RUABON

Charity number: 701308
Charity reporting is overdue by 755 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 755 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 755 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 June 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required