THE PENRITH AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the Society is the organising of the annual Penrith Agricultural Show as part of its objects of promotion of agriculture, farming and the countryside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 31 January 1990: Standard registration
- 09 February 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- PENRITH SHOW (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.41k | £98.06k | £98.45k | £76.54k | £77.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.42k | £88.58k | £92.32k | £95.58k | £101.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 11 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 11 March 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 01 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | 01 March 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 14 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | 14 February 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 1988
Charitable objects
ENCOURAGE IMPROVEMENTS IN THE BREEDING OF STOCK, THE MANAGEMENT OF LAND, AND IN THE GENERAL PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window