EDWARDS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 March 1989: Standard registration
- 10 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 10 May 2006: Funds transferred to 1105370 EDWARD'S TRUST LTD
- EDWARD HOUSE (Working name)
- SUNRISE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £542.77k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £517.34k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 18 July 2006 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 02 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | 02 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH FEBRUARY 1989
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO CHILDHOOD CANCERS AND TO DISSEMINATE AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY INCREASING AWARENESS OF COMPLEMENTARY APPROACHES TO CHILDHOOD CANCERS IN THE FAMILY; III) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH CANCER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window