DERBY FURNITURE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collect and redistribute furniture, electrical goods, clothing and bedding from people who no longer need them to people who are referred to us for help. Assist unemployed volunteers to gain the skills necessary to help them into paid employment. Reduce the ammount of bulky waste going to landfill or incineration by reusing it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 31 March 1989: Standard registration
- 26 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.44k | £142.12k | £121.92k | £111.62k | £113.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.76k | £155.32k | £134.79k | £125.69k | £123.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 22 March 2011 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 07 November 2011 | 280 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 09 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 09 December 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1989 AS AMENDED ON 5 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
A. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE OR OTHER HOUSEHOLD ACCESSORIES, CLOTHING AND BABY EQUIPMENT CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NO OTHER MEANS OF OBTAINING HELP. B. TO PROVIDE FOR THE TRAINING OF UNEMPLOYED VOLUNTEERS TO ENHANCE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES AND DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS.
Area of benefit
DERBY AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window