CYFEILLION CYSGOD Y GAER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to buy and maintain a mini bus for the use of the elderly and disable persond in the Corwen area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 05 April 1989: Standard registration
- 30 September 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- "CYFEILLION CYSGOD Y GAER" (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2007 | 01/03/2008 | 01/03/2009 | 01/03/2010 | 01/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £241 | £346 | £302 | £9 | £8 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2011 | 31 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2010 | 12 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2009 | 15 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2008 | 24 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THERELIEF OF THE RESIDENTS OF CYSGOD Y GAER HOME FOR THE ELDERLY, MAES AFALLEN, CORWEN, CLWYD AND OTHER ELDERLY AND HANDICAPPED PERSON RESIDENT IN THE AREABY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PURCHASE AND MAINTENANCE OF A MINI-BUS FOR THE USE OF SUCH PERSONS THAT PRIORITY SHALL ALWAYS BE GIVEN TO THE RESIDENTS OF THE HOME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window