SHENSTONE PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ENSURE THE UP KEEP AND RUNNING OF THE AREA OF SHENSTONE KNOW AS THE PLAYING FIELDS. PROVIDE AND MONITOR CHILDRENS PLAY AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,450 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 24 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Pugh | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Claire Baggot | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nicholas Fisher | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Thompson | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.99k | £1.47k | £2.38k | £6.07k | £20.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.50k | £579 | £2.77k | £2.43k | £5.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16 NOV 1988
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PLAYING FIELD FOR THE USE OF THEINHABITANS OF THE PARISH OF SHENSTONE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHENSTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shenstone Parish Council
25 Main Street
Shenstone
Lichfield
WS14 0LZ
- Phone:
- 01543481947
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window