Financial history SWANSEA CHILDREN'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity Number: 701418
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £77 £19.60k £1.23k £12.42k £36.10k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £118 £0 £3.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A