GROUNDWORK DERBY & DERBYSHIRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION THE ECONOMIC, ENVIRONMENTAL AND SOCIAL REGENERATION OF OUR AREA OF OPERATION. THIS IS ACHIEVED BY DELIVERING A PROGRAMME OF ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO ENHANCE THE PHYSICAL NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE AREA AND TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE COMMUNITY ENGAGEMENT IN ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY. THE CHARITY IS AFFILIATED TO GROUNDWORK UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Total income:
£1,581,746
Donations and legacies | £3.34k | |
Charitable activities | £1.58m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,536,615
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.52m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £16.12k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.52m | |
Retained for future use | £45.13k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 May 1989: Standard registration
- 10 March 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EREWASH GROUNDWORK TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- GROUNDWORK EREWASH VALLEY LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.48m | £1.77m | £1.31m | £1.35m | £1.61m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83m | £1.84m | £1.52m | £1.26m | £1.54m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £730.19k | £66 | £19.23k | £21.60k | £3.34k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.74m | £1.77m | £1.30m | £1.33m | £1.58m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.81k | £5.90k | £548 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.80m | £1.82m | £1.51m | £1.24m | £1.52m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £28.75k | £17.66k | £12.32k | £17.83k | £16.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £827.25k | £801.17k | £783.90k | £771.13k | £765.36k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £345.97k | £351.31k | £240.35k | £244.72k | £335.96k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £398.69k | £442.23k | £519.61k | £419.73k | £433.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 25 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 17 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/11/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2012
Charitable objects
2.1 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE CITY OF DERBY AND THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE, EXCLUDING THE BOROUGHS OF BOLSOVER, CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE (THE AREA). 2.2 TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN OR WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE AREA. 2.3 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OF THE WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME WHERESOEVER. 2.4 TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 2.4.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; 2.4.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 2.4.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 2.4.4 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORK SPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 2.4.5 THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 2.4.6 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ROUTEWAYS SUCH AS FOOTPATHS AND CYCLEWAYS AND ACCESS TO MAIN TRANSPORT ROUTES; 2.4.7 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 2.4.8 THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 2.4.9 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING THE RECLAMATION OF DERELICT LAND FOR USE AS OPEN SPACE; 2.4.10 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME, INCLUDING THE ALLEVIATION OF ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR; 2.4.11 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 2.5 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE AREA BY: 2.5.1 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; 2.5.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; 2.5.3 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. 2.6 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN THIS ARTICLE AND IN ARTICLE 2.5 ABOVE MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS”. 2.7 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO LOCAL COMMUNITY BASED GROUPS ANYWHERE IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
CITY OF DERBY & COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE (EXC BOROUGHS OF BOLSOVER, CHESTERFIELD & N E DERBYSHIRE) BUT INC DERWENT VALLEY, EREWASH VALLEY, NATIONAL FOREST AND PEAK DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window