WADDINGTON STREET CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Waddington Street Centre specialises in the provision of a wide range of learning opportunities for people experiencing mental health difficulties. We aim to help people live fulfilling lives in the community by offering opportunities for personal development, social interaction, and by supporting recovery. We are also committed to countering stigma and discrimination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £149,995 from 2 government contract(s) and £63,944 from 14 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 16 May 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF FRED ROBINSON | Chair | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Dodson | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lamb | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev David William Rushton | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Shipman | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|||||
LOUISE TOMS | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAY PARKER | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Anthony Blazey | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Rippon | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Dean | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ROBERT KELLY | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.94k | £359.91k | £408.26k | £263.44k | £275.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £367.04k | £340.92k | £369.94k | £354.21k | £337.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £239.55k | £150.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £160.16k | £169.29k | £8.00k | £63.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/12/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/1989 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: ESTABLISHING AND PROMOTING ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN ORDER TO SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS II. THIS WILL BE UNDERTAKEN PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF A RESOURCE CENTRE AND SUPPORT FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING III. THE CHARITY'S BENEFICIARIES ARE PRINCIPALLY PEOPLE LIVING IN COUNTY DURHAM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WADDINGTON STREET CENTRE LTD
3 WADDINGTON STREET
DURHAM
DH1 4BG
- Phone:
- 01913860702
- Email:
- alee@waddingtoncentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window