FRANCES MUERS' TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education by the provision at least every three years of grants to be applied to encourage and develop creative writing by children resident in the counties of North Yorkshire, West Yorkshire, South Yorkshire and Humberside or any part or parts thereof such grants to be determined by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 May 1989: Standard registration
- FRANCES MUER'S TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARTIN FARADAY MUERS | Chair |
|
||||||
Tony Firth | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Charlotte Williams | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH MARTIN MUERS | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELLA GEORGIANA WHITE | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE GEORGINA MUERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £11.22k | £11.75k | £13.52k | £8.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.19k | £10.27k | £15.03k | £12.03k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 June 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 MARCH 1989.AS AMENDED ON 11 MARCH 1996 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AT LEAST EVERY THREE YEARS OF GRANTS TO DEVELOP CREATIVE WRITING BY CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE COUNTIES OF NORTH YORKSHIRE, WEST YORKSHIRE, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, AND HUMBERSIDE ANY PART OR PARTS THEREOF SUCH GRANTS TO BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THE MANNER HEREAFTER STATED.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 The Drive
Roundhay
Leeds
LS8 1JF
- Phone:
- 01133459812
- Email:
- billhartley@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window