Accounts and annual returns PWYLLGOR EISTEDDFOD CLYNNOG FAWR CLYNNOG FAWR EISTEDDFOD

Charity number: 701546
Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 June 2021 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required