CHARLES WILLIAMS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the governors of Caerleon Endowed Schools in discharging their obligations under the various Education Acts in respect of the maintenance of the Schools and to provide the Schools with special benefits not normally provided by the Local Education Authority. In addition, grants and financial assistance are awarded to students and young people living in the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newport City
Governance
- 10 May 1989: Standard registration
- THE CAERLEON CHARITY (Working name)
- WILLIAM'S SCHOOLS (Previous name)
- WILLIAMS'S SCHOOLS (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIO BENAVIDES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Barbara Ruth Kehoe | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Stephen Cocks | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Claire Baker-Westhead | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Davies | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Gails | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Wessel | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Burley | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ven Jonathan Williams | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ford | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev SUSAN AVARINA PRATTEN | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|||||
GARETH WYN EDWARDS | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN MARSHALL OBE | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jason Hughes | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL IVOR SANSOM | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.83k | £198.31k | £168.71k | £163.44k | £176.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.13k | £86.07k | £91.15k | £163.00k | £461.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29/06/1878 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/08/1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 MAY 2017 as amended on 07 Dec 2017 as amended on 20 May 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE SCHOOL ELEMENT OF THE ENDOWMENT: A. ASSISTING THE GOVERNORS TO DISCHARGE THEIR OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1986 UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1986 WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOLS. B. PROVIDING AT THE SCHOOLS SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, C. AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES EXHIBITIONS, TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION. D. PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE STUDENTS ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, TO PREPARE FOR, AND TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION TRADE OR CALLING. E. AWARDING BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL WHETHER IN THIS COUNTRY OR ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION. F. PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS, G. PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL ANY PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF CAERLEON AND ADJOINING ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF LLANGATTOCK AND THE FORMER HAMLET OF CAERLEON-ULTRA-PONTEM, ALL IN THE COUNTY OF GWENT 2. THE ROAD ESTATE ELEMENT OF THE ENDOWMENT: INCOME ARISING FROM THE ABOVE MENTIONED ROAD ESTATE SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE REPAIR AND ADORNMENT OF THE CHURCH OF ST CADOC AND ITS CHURCHYARD AND IN MENDING AND REPAIRING THE ROADS LEADING INTO AND WITHIN THE TOWN AND, AS FAR AS NOT APPLIED, FOR THE EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OF THE SCHEME.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
School House
High Street
Caerleon
Newport
NP18 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01633423667
- Website:
-
charleswilliamscharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window