Accounts and annual returns HORNCASTLE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 701555
Charity reporting is overdue by 124 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 124 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 124 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 11 March 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 18 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 23 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required