Citizens Advice Sandwell & Walsall Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give generalist advice and support to clients at our six sites and various outreach sites. We also provide specialist advice in debt and welfare benefits. We can also refer clients to specialist advisers from other organisations, in employment, immigration, housing etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,960,167
Donations and legacies | £1.12k | |
Charitable activities | £1.90m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £13.28k | |
Other | £46.45k |
Total expenditure:
£2,017,717
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.02m | |
Other | £0 |
£13,276 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,026,571 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.02m |
People

68 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sandwell
- Walsall
Governance
- 10 May 1989: Standard registration
- 04 May 2022: Funds received from 1067723 WALSALL CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- Citizens Advice Sandwell Limited (Previous name)
- SANDWELL CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Clare | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Christie | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Loon | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Green | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Wright | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Bower | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lilley | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.89m | £2.74m | £2.61m | £2.14m | £1.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68m | £2.31m | £2.49m | £2.08m | £2.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £62.21k | N/A | £1.03m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £797.03k | £945.79k | £972.62k | £1.34m | £1.03m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £19.59k | £344.52k | £39 | £1.96k | £1.12k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.81m | £2.36m | £2.58m | £2.10m | £1.90m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.62k | £497 | £152 | £0 | £13.28k | |
|
Income - Other | £57.71k | £35.26k | £28.34k | £29.71k | £46.45k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.68m | £2.31m | £2.49m | £0 | £2.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.45k | £35.07k | £36.44k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.08m | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £17.72k | £57.32k | £49.14k | £51.97k | £29.19k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £707.76k | £1.12m | £1.22m | £1.22m | £1.17m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | -£5.32k | -£3.39k | -£1.58k | |
|
Total liabilities | £174.82k | £194.20k | £167.68k | £115.17k | £99.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MARCH 1989 AS AMENDED 11TH JANUARY 2002. as amended on 29 Mar 2017 as amended on 15 Oct 2020 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF SANDWELL, WALSALL AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
SANDWELL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AND ADJACENT AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Municipal Buildings
Halesowen Street
Oldbury
B69 2AB
- Phone:
- 01215536431
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window