MERCIA MS THERAPY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It provides a variety of therapies for people with multiple sclerosis & other ailments, children with Autism and cerebral palsy, all within the centre for the people of Coventry & surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 16 May 1989: Standard registration
- MERCIA FRIENDS OF ARMS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Kitson | Chair | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Claire Louise Allbut | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Duncan Partington | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Laura Barnes | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Derek Ridgway | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.35k | £100.74k | £115.29k | £153.87k | £147.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.72k | £113.97k | £105.34k | £159.39k | £140.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14 JULY 1993 as amended on 11 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
(1) TO AID AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THE CONDITION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS. (2) TO ASSIST ARMS (MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS RESEARCH) LIMITED IN PROMOTING (WHETHER OR NOT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT) ALL OR ANY OF ITS OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE AND CITY OF COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mrs Mary McDermott
8 MACEFIELD CLOSE
ALDERMANS GREEN INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
COVENTRY
CV2 2PJ
- Phone:
- 02476611088
- Email:
- info@merciamstherapy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window