DISABILITY DERBYSHIRE COALITION FOR INCLUSIVE LIVING LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DCIL is a charity for disabled people run by disabled people with the aim of facilitating independence in daily living activities, active participation in and full integration into society for disabled people by providing or encouraging provision of services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £369,653 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 May 1989: Standard registration
- 27 December 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- D C I L (Working name)
- THE DERBYSHIRE CENTRE FOR INTEGRATED LIVING (Previous name)
- THE DERBYSHIRE COALITION FOR INCLUSIVE LIVING (Previous name)
- THE DERBYSHIRE COALITION FOR INCLUSIVE LIVING LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £683.49k | £418.41k | £395.45k | £362.74k | £370.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £710.59k | £563.53k | £434.14k | £382.95k | £383.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £369.65k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £317.27k | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £669.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £331 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £694.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 28 June 2017 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 28 June 2017 | 148 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 22 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/07/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO BE OF BENEFIT TO PERSONS WITHIN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, WHO ARE SUBSTANTIALLY OR PERMANENTLY DISABLED BY PROVIDING OR ENCOURAGING THE PROVISION OF SERVICES WHICH FACILITATE INDEPENDENCE IN DAILY LIVING ACTIVITIES, ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN AND FULL INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
PRINCIPALLY WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window