THE ABERFAN MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and repair of cemetery memorials and memorial garden for victims of the Aberfan Disaster 1966
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Merthyr Tydfil
Governance
- 18 May 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Davies JP | Chair | 12 March 1998 |
|
|||||
Tania Stephens | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Iestyn Morgan JP | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA DAVIES | Trustee | 12 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ANDERSON | Trustee | 12 March 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £405.89k | £18.28k | £26.24k | £23.66k | £21.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £520.74k | £53.31k | £50.15k | £50.02k | £69.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £379.97k | N/A | £2.64k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 14 DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
A) FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE MEMORIAL GARDEN AND OF THE MEMORIAL IN THE CEMETERY AT ABERFAN AND FOR THE UPKEEP OF THE SAID CEMETERY, PARTICULARLY OF THE GRAVES THERIN OF VICTIMS OF THE ABERFAN DISASTER.B) FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED OF ALL THOSE WHO HAVE SUFFERED AS A RESULT OF THE ABERFAN DIASTER.(FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 18 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
ABERFAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
YNYSYGORED HOUSE
THE GROVE
ABERFAN
MERTHYR TYDFIL
CF48 4QA
- Phone:
- 01443690531
- Email:
- david@djdavies.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window