Accounts and annual returns THE EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, DUDLEY

Charity Number: 701579
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 22 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 16 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 20 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 29 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required