BRAUNSTON AND BROOKE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a community centre for the villages of Braunston & Brooke.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rutland
Governance
- 23 May 1989: Standard registration
- BRAUNSTON & BROOKE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- BRAUNSTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Harry | Chair | 07 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Butler | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phylippa Jane Nall | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Allen | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL THOMAS ANTHONY FAGAN | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE HARRY | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET TAYLOR | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anderson | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JIM ATACK | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE RITCHIE-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.02k | £20.72k | £24.82k | £23.82k | £20.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.80k | £12.06k | £15.45k | £28.23k | £20.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 December 2024 | 399 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 16 APRIL 1923
Charitable objects
A RECREATION ROOM FOR THE PARISHIONERS OF BRAUNSTON AFORESAID AND BROOKE TO PROVIDE SOCIAL INTERCOUSE MORAL AND MENTAL IMPROVEMENT AND RATIONAL ENJOYMENT INCLUDING DANCING AND ENTERTAINMENTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF BRAUNSTON AND BROOKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Village Hall
1 Wood Lane
Braunston
OAKHAM
Rutland
LE15 8QZ
- Phone:
- 01572774388
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window