Financial history NEWCASTLE ARTS CENTRE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 701598
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £166.10k £92.98k £137.99k £119.10k £185.24k
Total expenditure £120.07k £76.28k £110.58k £167.57k £177.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £55.00k £71.48k £42.67k N/A £14.67k