Trustees NEWCASTLE ARTS CENTRE TRUST LTD
Charity number: 701598

Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Robert Grainger | Chair | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kay Tilley | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kubra Mujdu | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alice Catherine Grace Fuller | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Kenrick | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE MCNIVEN | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|||||
HELEN ELIZABETH BURNS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN TILLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.