MERSEYSIDE COMMUNITY REHABILITATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help in the rehabilitation (including relief of poverty hardship or distress) of ex-offenders who live in the Districts of Sefton, Liverpool, Knowsley, St. Helens and Wirral who are now on probation and their families. We provide funds for: * access to employment (training and equipment) * setting up a new home (white goods and furniture) * obtaining necessary documents (passports etc)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 24 May 1989: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MERSEYSIDE PROBATION AND QUAKER TRUST FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF OFFENDERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2013 | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 30/11/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £426 | £426 | £26 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £0 | £3.90k | £11.69k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 19 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | 03 September 2016 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 MAR 1989 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA WHO ARE SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED SOME LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY (INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN SUBJECT TO PROBATION OR COMMUNITY SERVICE ORDERS) AND THEIR FAMILIES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
DIST OF SEFTON, LIVERPOOL, KNOWSLEY, ST. HELENS AND WIRRAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window