TELFORD AND DISTRICT LIGHT OPERATIC PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society was formed in 1972 with the aim of educating the public in the dramatic and operatic arts and to develop public appreciation of these arts. Over 80 shows have been produced throughout this period. Shows and concerts are performed with the Telford Area with "The Place" (the theatre) being used to stage the major shows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 24 May 1989: Standard registration
- T A D L O P (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Lampitt | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hassall | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip John McIver | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Kinnon | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Sonya Minshall | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA JANE LAMPITT | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Kee | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.10k | £6.82k | £15.12k | £20.30k | £47.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.67k | £4.11k | £13.46k | £28.44k | £60.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRARY 1989
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS (TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 York Road
Priorslee
TELFORD
Shropshire
TF2 9WD
- Phone:
- 07719779738
- Email:
- info@tadlop.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window