MACCLESFIELD ACCOMMODATION CARE AND CONCERN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides 24 hour supported accommodation to young single people aged 16 to 24 who are experiencing homelessness. M.A.C.C offer young people the chance to develop their skills and knowledge in order that they can successfully live independantly after moving on from the project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 03 January 1990: Standard registration
- 06 September 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 September 2011: Funds transferred to 1133376 MACCLESFIELD ACCOMMODATION CARE AND CONCERN LIMITE...
- MACC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £414.02k | £405.24k | £395.16k | £405.30k | £307.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £404.16k | £374.38k | £370.24k | £407.02k | £321.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 10 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 10 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 01 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 01 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 20 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 20 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEBRUARY 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMODATION FOR HOMELESS YOUNG PERSONS IN THE MACCLESFIELD AREA WHO ARE IN NEED AND REQUIRE ASSISTANCE IN ACHIEVING A SETTLED WAY OF LIFE AND TO EDUCATE SUCH PERSONS THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND MEMEBERS OF SOCIETY SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
MACCLESFIELD AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window