Financial history THE YORKSHIRE DANCE CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 701624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.03m £1.01m £1.08m £917.91k £927.04k
Total expenditure £980.05k £734.73k £1.04m £1.07m £1.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £108.57k £811.67k £403.16k £417.79k £396.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £768.78k £811.67k £859.38k £703.19k £653.33k
Income - Other trading activities £7.01k £51 £446 £1.96k £2.92k
Income - Charitable activities £42.54k £17.66k £56.84k £38.10k £69.55k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £202.44k £131.96k £147.73k £168.86k £201.23k
Income - Other £4.41k £50.91k £13.62k £5.81k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £848.17k £627.13k £864.84k £903.69k £879.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds £47.28k £37.25k £173.18k £169.38k £218.22k
Expenditure - Governance £23.89k £14.28k £4.35k £30.66k £24.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £84.59k £70.36k £0 £0 £0