Financial history THE SOUTH HOLDERNESS COUNTRYSIDE SOCIETY

Charity Number: 701627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6.37k £3.01k £4.12k £6.51k £3.93k
Total expenditure £5.29k £4.18k £4.58k £4.37k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A