Financial history BIGGIN VILLAGE HALL BY HARTINGTON

Charity number: 701669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.67k £11.04k £5.52k £8.61k £7.59k
Total expenditure £9.36k £4.16k £5.85k £9.80k £8.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A