BIGGIN VILLAGE HALL BY HARTINGTON

Charity number: 701669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bingo once a week. W.I. meetings. Whist drives. School uses hall for sports lessons. Social events, plays, etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,587
Total expenditure: £8,166

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pete Tapping Chair 30 November 2017
None on record
EMMA SHIMWELL Trustee 30 December 2017
None on record
MARY FENTEM Trustee 30 November 2015
None on record
KATHY LESLIE Trustee 27 November 2011
None on record
MELANIE WILTON Trustee
BIGGIN PLAYSCHOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.67k £11.04k £5.52k £8.61k £7.59k
Total expenditure £9.36k £4.16k £5.85k £9.80k £8.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 June 2024 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Laurels
Biggin
BUXTON
SK17 0DQ
Phone:
07989195858
Website:

No information available