ROTARY CLUB OF CANNOCK TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 701681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To make grants to individuals and organisations and to supply human resources to assist the same in accordance with the wishes and requirements of the Rotary Club of Cannock.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £25,600
Total expenditure: £29,014

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Ronald Gardiner Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
David Sydney Marklew Trustee 21 January 2014
None on record
ALAN DAY Trustee
STAFFORD AND CANNOCK LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS
Received: On time
JOHN ARTHUR EMILE WINTER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £44.35k £5.80k £22.46k £21.14k £25.60k
Total expenditure £44.46k £10.30k £22.95k £19.63k £29.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 21 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PEAR TREE COTTAGE
CHURCH LANE
CANNOCK
WS11 1RR
Phone:
01543574501
Website:

No information available