1ST MAGHULL (ST ANDREWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE INTERNATIONAL SCOUT MOVEMENT, AND OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY, GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND SOCIAL SKILLS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 28 June 1989: Standard registration
- FIRST SEFTON EAST SAINT ANDREWS SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN PATERSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL CLARE | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRIAN DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE CLARE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.47k | £17.00k | £31.77k | £31.92k | £27.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.51k | £11.12k | £32.41k | £31.28k | £42.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED ON 09 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 YORK ROAD
MAGHULL
LIVERPOOL
L31 5NL
- Phone:
- 01515318755
- Email:
- GSL1STMAGHULL@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window