Accounts and annual returns SAINT MARK'S HOUSE

Charity Number: 701703
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 18 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 18 November 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 27 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 28 August 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 20 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 20 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 22 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 07 July 2012 On Time