THE LLANDUDNO YOUTH MUSIC THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a youth music theatre and musical theatre workshops for the Llandudno and surrounding area for children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Conwy
Governance
- 30 June 1989: Standard registration
- LYMT (Working name)
- THE LLANDUDNO MUSIC THEATRE (Previous name)
- THE LLANDUDNO YOUTH MUSIC THEATRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian La Trobe | Chair |
|
||||||
JAMES TOFFREY | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Hannah Seaman | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Joyce | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Emmerson Mrs | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dan Whitemeir | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN SEAMAN | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS E HUTIN | Trustee | 09 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Colin Wickens | Trustee | 26 February 2004 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mark Jones | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOYA SEAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.37k | £7.40k | £34.16k | £20.95k | £38.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.20k | £4.81k | £41.66k | £33.02k | £37.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £650 | N/A | £500 | £500 | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/02/1989 AS AMENDED ON 22/02/1996 AS AMENDED ON 21/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Craig Y Don Community Centre
Queens Road
LLANDUDNO
LL30 1TE
- Phone:
- 01492875681
- Email:
- info@lymt.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window