THE HARTINGTON PATIENTS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We purchase medical equipment to benefit patients of the Hartington Surgery
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 03 July 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Coles | Chair | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ANGELA ANDREWS | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hodgkinson | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ASHLEY DAWSON | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21k | £749 | £1.32k | £5.95k | £5.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £0 | £2.06k | £3.46k | £560 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUNE 1989
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PATIENTS ATTENDING THE HARTINGTON SURGERY IN THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND AMENITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE FAMILY PRACTITIONER COMMITTEE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID SURGERY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIG STREET
HARTINGTON
BUXTON
DERBYSHIRE
SK17 0AQ
- Phone:
- 01298 84315
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window