GREEN APPLE CRAFTS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching, encouraging and promoting arts and crafts activities amongst all groups of people but particularly amongst children, the elderly and those with special social and educational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 05 July 1989: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- GREEN APPLE CRAFTS (Working name)
- GREEN APPLE CRAFTS PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 10 June 2008 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JUNE 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED THE 20 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS TO PURSUE ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE:- (I) TO EDUCATE BY ENCOURAGING A GREATER AWARENESS OF INTEREST IN ARTISTIC AND CREATIVE ACTIVITY, (II) TO EDUCATE, TRAIN AND EQUIP THOSE WORKING TO ENGAGE IN ARTISTIC AND CREATIVE ACTIVITY, (III) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY DEVELOPING ARTISTIC AND CREATIVE ACTIVITIES PARTICULARLY AMONGST THOSE FOR WHOM THE AVENUES OF COMPETITIVE ACTIVITY ARE UNFULFILLING BY VIRTUE OF EITHER DISINTEREST OR DISABILITY WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, (IV) TO PURSUE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH THE COMPANY THINKS FIT FOR PURSUIT IN CONJUNCTION WITH ANY OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window