WEST YORKSHIRE NORTH GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enables girls & young women to fulfill their potential to take an active & responsible role in society through its distinctive stimulating & enjoyable programme of activities delivered by trained volunteer leaders. The aim is to help girls and young women develop emotionally, mentally, physically & spiritually so they can make a positive contribution to their community & the wider world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
537 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 12 July 1989: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING WEST YORKSHIRE NORTH (Working name)
- WEST YORKSHIRE NORTH COUNTY GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Bolton | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Becky Hutchinson | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.61k | £30.42k | £37.69k | £42.07k | £51.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.67k | £21.86k | £23.66k | £29.36k | £33.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £22.32k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 December 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 December 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barn House
Hob Lane
Stanbury
KEIGHLEY
West Yorkshire
BD22 0HW
- Phone:
- 07775780183
- Email:
- kaybolton@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
wynguiding.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window