WEST YORKSHIRE POLICE (EMPLOYEES) BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL HELP TO WEST YORKSHIRE POLICE STAFF EMPLOYEES AND EX EMPLOYEES WHO ARE CONSIDERED, BY THE TRUSTEES, AS NEEDY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 31 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Osman Khan | Chair | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Estcourt Lomas | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simone Alexa Stacey | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Kirrane | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alec Neil Marsden | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Reeves | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Helen Brear | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Jordan | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE EDWARDS | Trustee | 14 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.58k | £4.05k | £1.97k | £1.02k | £1.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £8.89k | £4.61k | £7.70k | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEBRUARY 1989 AS AMENDED 12 JANUARY 1993 AND 21 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 05 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 SEP 2016 as amended on 09 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED WHO ARE EMPLOYEES, FORMER EMPLOYEES OR UNDER THE DIRECT CONTROL OF THE CHIEF CONSTABLE OR WHO ARE THEIR DEPENDANTS, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND ORPHANS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WYP EMPLOYEES BENEVOLENT FUND
FINANCE DEPARTMENT
P O BOX 9
WAKEFIELD
WEST YORKSHIRE
WF1 3QP
- Phone:
- 01924296989
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window